# Category: mental math

## Mental Math – Tricks or Real Help

Mental Math  – is it a trick or can it truly help your child to learn math?

I found this article from article dashboard and wanted to share it with you. It discusses 2 methods that are currently being used in Asia.

Mental Math Methods From Asia

First of all, let us figure out what exactly is mental math. Today if you search the phrase “mental math” you will probably end up with millions of options. Not exactly that makes your life easy; instead it builds up and strengthens your curiosity. Put in simplest terms, mental math can be defined as calculations performed in your head – mentally – without help of any external device be it as simple as pen and paper or any modern day device such as calculator, computer or any other electronic gadget.

We humans perform mental mathematical calculations everyday, consciously and unconsciously. When you are driving you figure out when to apply brakes to bring the vehicle to stop before hitting something. You figure out time difference between east coast and west coast. But where we falter is at the simplest and most mundane of calculations. Go to a restaurant and figure out 18% gratuity.

Abacus Mental Mathematics

What is abacus mental mathematics? Origin of Abacus is highly disputed today, some say it originated in Mesopotamia and some claim to be in China. Over centuries, abacus has evolved in to various different forms and sizes. The most commonly used is the Japanese Soroban Abacus.

The Soroban Abacus consists of one upper row and four lower rows and columns vary from thirteen, fifteen, seventeen or twenty one. It is claimed and proven by many researchers in Asia that Abacus stimulates whole brain development. When children use both hands to move the abacus beads to perform arithmetic calculations, there is quick communication between the hands and the brain that stimulates both the right and left hemispheres of the brain. This promotes rapid, balanced whole brain development.

If a child starts learning the abacus before being taught traditional arithmetic, there is minimal conflict and the child will easily work within both systems. If a child starts the program later, having already received traditional foundations, there may be a slightly extended learning period for the child to accept and integrate the abacus method.

Vedic Mental Mathematics

What is Vedic mental mathematics? Origin of Vedic Mathematics is in Atharva Veda (Holy Scripture from Hinduism). Vedic mathematics is a system based on sixteen sutras (aphorisms) which are actually word-formulae describing natural ways of solving a whole range of mathematical problems. These formulae describe the way the mind naturally works and are therefore a great help in directing the student to the appropriate method of solution.

It is claimed and proven by many researchers in Asia that practice and use of Vedic mathematics helps the person in many different aspects of decision making. From intelligent guessing to thinking outside the box ability. Vedic mathematics has its applications to much advanced mathematics, such as calculus and linear algebra. The sixteen sutras are: By one more than the one before, All from 9 and the last from 10, Vertically and crosswise, Transpose and apply, If the Samuccaya is the same it is zero, If one is in ratio the other is zero, By addition and by subtraction, By the completion or non-completion, Differential calculus, By the deficiency, Specific and general, The remainders by the last digit, The ultimate and twice the penultimate, By one less than the one before, The product of the sum, and All the multipliers

Today, both these methods have made a come back in Asia. Abacus Mental Math method is extremely popular in nations of China, Taiwan, Japan, Malaysia, Korea and India whereas Vedic Mental Math method is extremely popular only in India.

What do you think?

## Cool Math Tricks

I find it fascinating when I can learn a new trick to help with mathematical problems. So as you can imagine, I thoroughly enjoyed this article!

Cool Mental Math Tricks

The fantastic 11 rule
There is a great likelihood that many people know the 10 rule. That is, when you multiply a number by 10, you add a 0 at the end of the number. However, the 11 rule may be unknown to many. It is so easy to comprehend.
– As you multiply any two digit number by 11
– Let us take 36 for this example (3-6) and notice the gap in between them.
– Then, sum up the two digits, 3 and 6 together
– Put the result, 9 in the gap in between.
– That is simply done 39 x 11=3 96
However, there is one tricky thing that you should remember, if the result after you have added the two digits is more than9, put only the digit representing the “ones” in the gap. For example:
74×11…7_4….4 +7=11…
Put the 1 in the gap, and add 1 to the 7 to get 8, therefore, the answer to 74 x 11 = 814
How to multiply by 999, 99 or 9
Multiplying a number by 9 is just like multiplying it by 10-1.
As such, multiplying 9 × 9 is9 (10-1) whose result is 90 -9 = 81
Another example:
9 × 68… = 68 10-1)
= 680 – 68
= 612
To multiply a number by 99 is the same as by (100-1)
47 multiplied by 99….47 (100-1)
=4700-47…=4653
Multiplying a number by 1000 means the same as multiplying the same by (1000-1)
Therefore, 55 multiplied by 1000 is the same as…..55(1000-1)
=55000-55
=54945
How to squ9are two digit numbers
Take for example that you want to square 48. The first step is squaring each of the digits to get the partial results.
4 × 4 16 and 8 × 8 = 64. Then put the two digits together, 1664.
From there, you should multiply the digits of the number that you want to square….4 × 8=32
Double the resulting product to get 64
Mathematics can be a terrifying idea for many people but with these cool mental math tricks and a bit of practice to perfect them, the general knowledge and speed in math will considerably improve.

Article Directory: http://www.articledashboard.com

So there you have it – another cool math trick to add to your always-growing math resource library.

Have a great day!

To learn much more about the mental maths, mental math tricks can be found at mentalmathtricks.com/.

## Complex Math and Mental Math

Is mental math necessarily complex math? I don’t think so!

I found a short article which helps to teach students how to deal with complex and mental math (as well as easy math)!

Check it out:

Mental Maths Activities That Are Beneficial

Considered a complex subject, most students find it intimidating and for most of them, as they age, it becomes more complicated. Though this is the case, it is an important part of life as it equips them with the necessary skills to face real life.

Mental maths should be introduced from kindergarten grades to students who have a lower capacity of understanding maths. This should be done with easy to answer questions. If it is in a class setting, then the students should be presented with simplified math equations and the first one to get the right answer should shout it out. As this progress, it will eventually reach a point where the entire class shouts out the right answer as a team. As they age and get more equations correctly, then more complex math should be introduced. In this instance, students can use time tables, basic algebra and division facts. For instance this could be something that Y plus four equals 10 and the students should answer what Y is.

Complex Math
A large percentage of maths used in day to day life is mental math tricks. For instance, someone working at a store should figure out what 60% of \$20 is, a driver is supposed to figure out how many hours he will drive to cover a 230 mile trip among others. This proves that math is an important part of life and as such, it is ideal to ensure that students solve mental maths equation every day. However, when carrying this out, it is important to ensure that it is age appropriate. For seventh graders 60% of \$ 230 is ideal while for fourth graders 10% of 100 is appropriate. Students should be given the time to read the equation and work it out before providing the answers.

Story Problems
This is another important mental maths activity to indulge in. It should be on situational stories and students should be encouraged to work them out mentally. Also known as multi-mental math they are the best. This is attributed to the fact that they require more thought for the answer to be processed as well as mimicking the manner in which maths is used in real life situations. However, it is important to outline the equation in a manner that is easy to understand. Though challenging, these simple mannerisms when employed in the right manner, help students develop an instinctive accuracy handling mental maths.

Article Directory: http://www.articledashboard.com

To learn much more about the mental math tricks, maths tips can be found at mentalmathtricks.com/.

So  has this changed your mind? Do you believe that these tricks and exercises can helpyour child to learn complex math?

Let me know?

Have a super Memorial Day Holiday.

.

.

## Mental Math and Your Child

Here’s a very interesting article I found on teaching your child mental math via the Vedic Math system. Makes for a very good read.

Homeschool Your Child To Vedic Math – The Worlds Fastest Mental Math System

Some questions to ponder:

– How could the Aryan civilization, near the Hunza Valley, 5,000 years ago, mentally compute mathematical operations that today only a calculator could achieve?

– And if the Math could not be done mentally, how could they do everything we know today, IN ONE-LINE? eg: converting the fraction 1/19 into a decimal is an 18 digit answer that requires 35 lines of exhausting long division, how could they do it in a one simple line solution?

– Why is NASA using this MENTAL ONE-LINE SYSTEM OF ARITHMETIC in the field of Advanced Artificial Intelligence? Why is INTEL using it in chip designing?

– How can your child become a Human Bio-Calculator?

– Is the current Western Math Curriculum keeping our Children in a state of limited intelligence?

You are home schooling your 14 year old teen in Math. You feel you can instill better values, character and education to your children. You want to give the Best to your child. You want to provide quality which is unattainable in schools. Imagine how your child would feel when he immediately realizes that you are teaching him powerful ways to do Math Calculations without any extra burden on the both of you. Infact he would now want you to take the Math Classes more often so that he gets a hang on to these new systems.

This system of teaching Math can complement your family’s strong learning system and can instill the values you want to develop in your child. It requires just knowledge of multiplication tables up to 9 to start learning it and it is easy to learn, Master and teach your child without being overwhelmed. Infact once you spend 2 minutes with your child on teaching him how to do this sum (shown here) he can at once teach 5 more of his friends to do it. It’s that simple!
Here’s a quick example of one of the Technique:

65 x 65 = ?

It is quite simple since both digits start from 6, so you take 6 and multiply with the next number 7 which gives you= 42 , the first part of the answer and take 5 and multiply by the next units 5 which gives you 25,so the final answer is 4225. Try 85 x 85 now. Answer 7225. Try 95 x 95 – Answer 9025 in the similar way.

Now how long did that take? This method can also be said to be the fastest in the world in mental math.

This system has the prowess to speed up Math Calculations by up to 1500% and supposedly seemingly difficult calculations like 998 x 997 can be solved in less than five seconds flat. With this system you can home school your child into becoming a Human Bio Calculator in a matter of a week’s time.

The answers to the question posed by this article in the beginning are found by understanding the ancient Indian system of High Speed Vedic (Sanskrit for Knowledge) Mathematics. It was rediscovered by Tirthaji (1884-1960) who was dux of India in Math and Sanskrit Philosopher who wrote and spoke perfect English. He reached the position of a Respected Pope in India, toured the United States in 1958 giving math lectures in Stanford, Caltech and even MIT and discovered the math knowledge which can solve every known math problem mentally and faster. He called his book and the subject ‘Vedic Mathematics’ after the Indian Scriptures called Vedas which mean knowledge. It is absolutely mathematical, scientific and global in nature and has nothing to do with any religion. Which means any person of any religion, country, ethnicity, color or race can use it and apply it and enjoy its tremendous benefits all across the world. No wonder it is being used by students from around the Globe of every race and origin to making their math calculations easier and is increasingly getting popular. Even NASA, INTEL and Microsoft are using it for the high end applications of Vedic Math.

A Look at this High Speed Vedic Mental Math tutorials and slide shows confirms the fact that it is indeed a miracle waiting to happen to your child.

Any teenager can learn Vedic Mathematics and enhance his numerical abilities. It helps the students not only in traditional academics, but it also enhances the IQ by enhancing the analytical skills and thought processes. This happens because the system is very coherent and intuitive and uses both sides of the brain thereby giving the student the winning edge. It is very satisfying to see young children’s eyes brighten when they see and learn the High Speed Vedic system and techniques.

Thomas, a 16 year old was able to apply these techniques with ease and without confusion when he learnt the Vertically and Crosswise Formula of multiplying two and three digit numbers Mentally and in One Line. He was able to solve correctly over 75 problems in less than 10 minutes which normally takes from 45-90 minutes to solve. This is simply incredible.

So how do you get started and homeschool your child into this system in a week’s time?

First your child should be over 14 years of age and should know multiplication tables upto 9. That is the only criteria to learn this system.

Try going through the High Speed Vedic Mental Math tutorials and see if your child enjoys the new methods. Show them the slide shows. You would have live results for your self whether or not to choose this as an alternative means to learn Math.

Squares of Numbers ending in 5

Multiplying numbers by 11-19 in less than five seconds

Instant Subtractions

Speed Division by 9.

See if he shows an interest. It shouldn’t overwhelm or burden him in any way. It should be as natural as possible.

Ask Questions to us. Go through the FAQ on our website below. Clarify your doubts you would have before deciding to introduce your child to it.

If you feel satisfied and your child is showing interest order a book or a DVD Set of over 10 hours on this phenomenal system which would suit your child best. I am sure if you could do these methods and are wondering why you didn’t learn them as a child-remember you could relive your childhood by introducing them to your child now. You could be igniting such a spark in your child now that he could be using this system for all his life and even introducing them to the next generation.

Give your child the best of education unattainable in schools.

By:
Article Directory: http://www.articledashboard.com

This Article is by Gaurav Tekriwal, who has been conducting High Speed Vedic Maths Workshops and has trained over ten thousand students across the world in the field. He is an expert in the field and revolutionizes the way children learn math.

.

So after reading this, are you ready to help your 14+ year old learn math via the Vedic Math system? Or maybe YOU just want to learn this?  😉

Have a great New Year!

.

.